Dogfen lywodraethu HOSPICE UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/01/2014 as amended on 19 May 2021 as amended on 04 Jul 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO FACILITATE AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF, CARE AND TREATMENT OF THE SICK, ESPECIALLY OF THE DYING, AND THE SUPPORT AND CARE OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND OF THE BEREAVED; (B) TO FACILITATE AND PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THOSE PERSONS (WHETHER INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS0 WHICH PROVIDE AND/OR SUPPORT HOSPICE CARE; (C) TO PROVIDE OR FACILITATE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PROFESSIONALS AND VOLUNTEERS ENGAGED IN PALLIATIVE CARE AND INCREASE AWARENESS AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE VALUES, PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF HOSPICE AND PALLIATIVE CARE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.