Dogfen lywodraethu Lincolnshire and Nottinghamshire Air Ambulance Charity
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 21 JANUARY 1997 AND 21 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 SEP 2016 as amended on 11 Oct 2022 as amended on 04 Apr 2024 as amended on 07 Feb 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND INJURY AND THE PROTECTION OF HUMAN LIFE BY THE PROVISION AND/OR SUPPORT OF AN AIR AMBULANCE SERVICE AND/OR OTHER EMERGENCY TRANSPORTATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POPULATION PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN THE COUNTIES OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Maes buddion
THROUGHOUT THE COUNTY OF LINCOLSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.