Dogfen lywodraethu TYNEDALE HOSPICE AT HOME
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1994. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JUNE 2009. AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 2021 NULL AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 MAY 2023 as amended on 30 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF END OF LIFE CARE, ASSOCIATED SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO OTHER PALLIATIVE CARE PROVIDERS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE AREA OF TYNEDALE, WEST NORTHUMBERLAND AND PONTELAND.
Maes buddion
TYNEDALE NORTHUMBERLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.