Dogfen lywodraethu WILL WOODLANDS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 23 JUNE 1994, 7 OCTOBER 1996, 11 MAY 1998, 7 MARCH 2001 AND 17 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 31 DECEMBER 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES ONLY AND (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO OR LIMITATION OF THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING WORDS) FOR THE CONSERVATION, RESTORATION AND ESTABLISHMENT OF TREES, PLANTS, AND ALL FORMS OF WILDLIFE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND TO SECURE AND ENHANCE THE ENJOYMENT BY THE PUBLIC OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THOSE TERRITORIES.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.