Dogfen lywodraethu Age UK Rotherham Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JULY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 FEB 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 MAR 2022 as amended on 23 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT: 3.1.1 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; 3.1.2 ADVANCING EDUCATION; 3.1.3 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL); 3.1.4 PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; 3.1.5 PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 3.1.6 ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 3.1.7 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; THE OUTCOME OF THIS BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF ROTHERHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.