Dogfen lywodraethu CENTRE 81 LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/02/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 DEC 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF INDIVIDUALS WITH PHYSICAL, SENSORY OR OTHER DISABILITIES IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A CENTRE FOR THE PURPOSES OF RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE GREAT YARMOUTH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.