Dogfen lywodraethu DEMENTIA MATTERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/02/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/1995 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 SEP 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED AS A RESULT OF DEMENTIA OR OTHER DEGENERATIVE NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS, ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY, MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING, SENSORY OR OTHER PROBLEMS ARISING FROM AGEING, ILLNESS OR DISEASE; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY OF CARERS AND EX-CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES; (C) THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO OBTAIN ACCESS TO THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS; (D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST CARERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC REGARDING DEMENTIA AND OTHER ISSUES REFERRED TO IN CLAUSE (A) ABOVE
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.