Dogfen lywodraethu MUSIC IN HOSPITALS AND CARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/11/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/09/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 SEP 2017 as amended on 05 Mar 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY THE USE OF HIGH QUALITY MUSIC AS A THERAPEUTIC AGENT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.