Dogfen lywodraethu RELATE DACORUM, WATFORD & THREE RIVERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21/021996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 26/06/1997, 08/12/2003, 27/10/2008, AND 15/10 2009 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 14/11/2009 AND BY CERT. OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 07/01/2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 2 TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 3 TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: 3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR 3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 5 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE THE BOROUGHS OF DACORUM, WATFORD AND DISTRICT OF THREE RIVERS AND IN CONJUNCTION WITH NEIGHBOURING RELATE CENTRES THE BOROUGH OF HERTSMERE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.