Dogfen lywodraethu FELBRIDGE BEEF AND FAGGOT CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
REP.VOL.13.P.539. SCHEMES OF 11TH DEC.1866, 8TH.JULY 1904 (ORDER), AND 24TH AUG.1906 VARIED BY SCHEME OF 13TH MAR. 1956. CODICIL TO WILL OF 3RD JULY 1793.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE DIVINE,FELBRIDGE OR WITHIN A RADIUS OF 2.5 MILES AT FELBRIDGE TO PROVIDE 1)FOOD, CLOTHING, FUEL AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO NEEDY PARISHIONERS IRRESPECTIVE OF AGE. 2) ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE. 3) SUBSCRIPTIONS TO HOMES, HOSTELS FOR OLD, INFIRM OR HOMELESS POOR. 4) SUBSCRIPTIONS TO ALMSHOUSES. 5) AID IN SICKNESS.
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.