Dogfen lywodraethu BATTERSEA DOGS' AND CATS' HOME
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 16TH AUGUST, 1933, AS AMENDED 20TH JUNE 2002 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 JUNE 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUN 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO RESCUE AND CARE FOR, REUNITE WITH THEIR OWNERS, REHABILITATE AND RE-HOME WITH NEW OWNERS DOGS AND CATS. (B) TO PROVIDE VETERINARY TREATMENT TO DOGS AND CATS IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHARITY WHICH MAY INCLUDE EUTHANASIA. (C) TO DEAL WITH OTHER ANIMALS IN THE SAME MANNER AS IS PROVIDED IN RESPECT OF DOGS AND CATS BY SUB-CLAUSES A AND B OF THIS CLAUSE.
Maes buddion
THE CITY OF LONDON AND METROPOLITAN POLICE DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.