Dogfen lywodraethu CCHF ALLABOUTKIDS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/05/1921 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/12/1921 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/06/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/08/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/09/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/10/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/10/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NECESSITOUS SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE
Maes buddion
LONDON AND UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.