Dogfen lywodraethu RELATE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/02/1952 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/1956 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/05/1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE FEDERATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: (1)TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; (2)TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: (A)INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND (B)WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; (3)TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: (A)MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR (B)INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; (4)TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (5)TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.”
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.