Dogfen lywodraethu THE GUILD OF BENEVOLENCE OF THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES MAY 1958 AS AMENDED 6TH OCTOBER 1964, 29TH APRIL 1969, 24TH APRIL 1973, 13TH APRIL 1977, 9TH MARCH 1989, 12 MARCH 1998, 7TH MARCH 2002 AND 13 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 MAR 2014 as amended on 11 Mar 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE GRANTING OF RELIEF TO NECESSITOUS AND DESERVING PERSONS WHO ARE (A) PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTE AND PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS, (B) MARINE ENGINEERS WHO POSSESS OR HAVE POSSESSED CERTIFICATES OF COMPETENCY OR CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE ISSUED BY THE RELEVANT UK GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENT OR AGENCY OR THEIR EQUIVALENT, (C) PAST AND PRESENT EMPLOYEES OF THE INSTITUTE OR OF THE GUILD AND (D) THE WIVES, HUSBANDS, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, CHILDREN AND/OR DEPENDANTS OF ANY OF THE PERSONS REFERRED TO IN THE PRECEDING PARAGRAPHS.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.