Dogfen lywodraethu YORKSHIRE MINERS' WELFARE CONVALESCENT HOMES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 25/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16/12/2002 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION OF CONVALESCENT FACILITIES IN ONE OR MORE CONVALESCENT HOMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE AREA OF THE CHARITY EITHER IN THE COAL INDUSTRY OR IN ACTIVITIES ALLIED TO THOSE OF THE COAL INDUSTRY AND THEIR WIVES, HUSBANDS AND DEPENDANT RELATIVES AND THE WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND NECESSITOUS RELATIVES OF DECEASED PERSONS WHO WERE IN THEIR LIFETIME EMPLOYED AS AFORESAID
Maes buddion
ANY AREA WHICH FORMALLY AT ANY TIME WAS COMPRISED WITHIN ANY OF THE YORKSHIRE AREAS OF THE NATIONAL COAL BOARD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.