Trosolwg o’r elusen THE SAMARITANS OF SALISBURY AND DISTRICT
Rhif yr elusen: 1168019-1
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
RULES ADOPTED 17/04/1966
AS AMENDED ON 27/02/1979
AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2002
AS AMENDED ON 03/10/2007
AS AMENDED ON 06/04/2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN SALISBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION, AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS.
Maes buddion
SALISBURY AND SURROUNDING AREA
Hanes cofrestru
- 18 Mawrth 1970: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- SALISBURY SAMARITANS (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.