Dogfen lywodraethu BUXTON CIVIC ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DEC 1968 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 OCT 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF BUXTON IN THE COUNTY OF DERBY (HEREINAFTER TOGETHER CALLED "THE SAID AREA") OF LANDS AND BUILDINGS OF BEAUTY, ENVIRONMENTAL OR HISTORIC INTEREST.
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.