Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL NAVAL DIVISION MEMORIAL CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH JUNE 1926 AND SCHEMES OF THE 26TH MAY 1971, 9 APRIL 1973, 29 JANUARY 1988 & 24 APRIL 1996.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE ROYAL NAVAL DIVISION MEMORIALS AND FOR THAT PURPOSE SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE ADMINISTRATIVE TRUSTEES FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT:- A) FIRST IN PROVIDING FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE ROYAL NAVAL DIVISION MEMORIAL AT BEAUCOURT-SUR-L'ANCRE FRANCE. B) SECONDLY IN PROVIDING FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF ANY OTHER MEMORIALS OF THE ROYAL NAVAL DIVISION OR ANY BATTALION THEREOF WHEREVER SITUATE. C) THIRDLY FOR PROVIDING AND PLACING IN EACH YEAR SUITABLE WREATHS ON SUCH MEMORIALS OR ON ANY OF THEM.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.