Dogfen lywodraethu HAMPTON AND HAMPTON HILL VOLUNTARY CARE GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 1976 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 12TH MAY 1982, 20TH OCTOBER 1993, AND 24TH MAY 1994 AND 18TH MAY 1999
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE SOCIAL SERVICES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE WARDS OF HAMPTON, HAMPTON HILL AND HAMPTON NURSERY AS CONSTITUTED FROM TIME TO TIME IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SERVICES ARE INTENDED AND OF TRAINING THEM IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION.)
Maes buddion
WARDS OF HAMPTON AND HAMPTON HILL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.