Dogfen lywodraethu WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD YOUTH COUNSELLING SERVICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/1976 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/1977 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/1980 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF YOUNG PEOPLE, FAMILIES AND CARERS,IN THE COMMUNITIES OF WINDSOR, MAIDENHEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, ON AT LEAST TWO SITES, BY MAINTAINING AND DEVELOPING A YOUTH AND COMMUNITY COUNSELLING SERVICE FOR THE GIVING OF INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Maes buddion
WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.