Dogfen lywodraethu POOLE ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/05/1978 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/1978 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/1996 AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2002 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/2004 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/11/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESENT A RICH AND WELL BALANCED ARTISTIC PROGRAMME TO HELP DEVELOP THE TASTES, EXPECTATIONS AND EXPERIENCES OF THE ARTS AND ENTERTAINMENT PRIMARILY FOR RESIDENTS OF AND VISITORS TO POOLE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS AND TO PROVIDE AUDIENCES WITH OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING, PARTICIPATING AND EXPERIENCING A WIDE VARIETY OF COMPLEMENTARY ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE POOLE)
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.