Dogfen lywodraethu THE EGHAM MUSEUM TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/03/1979 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/01/1980 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/10/1988 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/06/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN OR NEAR EGHAM, WHICH, THROUGH ITS EXHIBITIONS, OUTREACH PROGRAMMES AND USE OF ITS COLLECTIONS, AIMS TO PROVIDE FOR THE COMMUNITIES OF EGHAM, EGHAM HYTHE, ENGLEFIELD GREEN, THORPE AND VIRGINIA WATER A CENTRE OF LIFE-LONG LEARNING DEDICATED TO RAISING AWARENESS, SHARING KNOWLEDGE AND PROMOTING ENJOYMENT OF LOCAL HISTORY. B) THE PROVISION OF THE AFOREMENTIONED MUSEUM WITH FACILITIES AND A BUDGET FOR ITS DAY-TO-DAY OPERATION, RESEARCH AND OUTREACH ACTIVITIES, THE CONTINUED IMPROVEMENT OF ITS SERVICES AND THE EXTENSION, ENHANCEMENT, CONSERVATION AND STORAGE OF ITS COLLECTIONS FOR THE CONTINUED ENJOYMENT AND BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND VISITORS.
Maes buddion
EGHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.