Dogfen lywodraethu URBANWISE.LONDON LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1987, 28TH MARCH 1990, 1ST NOVEMBER 1994 AND 1ST SEPTEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION AT ALL LEVELS IN AN URBAN SETTING WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO, BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO, THE GREATER LONDON AREA BY THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM.
Maes buddion
HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.