Dogfen lywodraethu AUTISM HAMPSHIRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/03/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/12/2013 as amended on 01 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
AUTISM HAMPSHIRE IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, ADULT SERVICES, OUTREACH AND TRAINING SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WITH AUTISM OR SIMILAR CONDITIONS AND FOR THE WIDER AUTISM COMMUNITY IN PORTSMOUTH, SOUTHAMPTON, HAMPSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE (“THE OBJECTS”).
Maes buddion
HAMPSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.