Dogfen lywodraethu SENSE, THE NATIONAL DEAFBLIND AND RUBELLA ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/06/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2012 as amended on 16 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3 Objects The objects for which the Charity is established (the "Objects") are to: 3.1 primarily support and promote the interests of persons who are deafblind or have multi-sensory impairments; 3.2 and to support persons who, by virtue of having a learning disability or one or more mental or physical impairments, or sensory impairment(s), require care and/or communication support (together, the "beneficiaries").
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.