Dogfen lywodraethu THE BUTLER TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/03/1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/03/1988 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/12/1989 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29/10/1990 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21/09/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FURTHER AND PROMOTE PRACTICE AMONG THOSE WORKING IN THE PENAL SYSTEM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHICH CONTRIBUTES TO: THE REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME; THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION OF OFFENDERS BY FACILITATING THEIR INTEGRATION AND CONSTRUCTIVE ENGAGEMENT IN SOCIETY; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HEALTH, SAFETY AND PSYCHOLOGICAL WELL BEING OF OFFENDERS AND THOSE WHO WORK WITH THEM.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.