Dogfen lywodraethu FERRING COUNTRY CENTRE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 DEC 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 DEC 1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 SEP 2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 MAY 2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04 JUN 2019 as amended on 08 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH WORKING FACILITIES IN HORTICULTURE, AGRICULTURE, CRAFTS, EQUESTRIANISM AND OTHER RELATED MATTERS WITH THE AIM OF ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL AND SOCIAL SKILLS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.