Dogfen lywodraethu THE MAGIC CIRCLE FOUNDATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 AUG 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 OCT 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 JAN 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 APR 1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 MAY 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND PRACTICE OF THE ART OF MAGIC IN PARTICULAR BY MAINTAINING A LIBRARY AND MUSEUM OF MAGIC WORKS AND ARTEFACTS BY PROMOTING PUBLIC LECTURES AND BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.