Dogfen lywodraethu THE ABBEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH MAY 1988 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 1994 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2008 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 07 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.(B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUTED BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
BRYMPTON AND NORTH WEST YEOVIL AND THEIR ENVIRONS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.