Dogfen lywodraethu DIAL - GT YARMOUTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 03/05/1984 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/1985 AS AMENDED ON 27/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 FEB 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL DISABLED AND VULNERABLE PEOPLE WITHIN GREAT YARMOUTH AND THE NORFOLK AREA, BY THE PROVISION OF A DIRECT INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO PEOPLE WITHIN THE GREAT YARMOUTH AND THE NORFOLK AREA BY THE PROVISION OF A DEBT AND MONEY MANAGEMENT ADVICE SERVICE. TO PROMOTE PHYSICAL ACTIVITY TO PEOPLE WITHIN THE GREAT YARMOUTH AND NORFOLK AREA BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO ACCESS LOCAL EXERCISE AND SPORTING GROUPS. TO PROVIDE VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES TO INDIVIDUALS WITHIN GY AND NORFOLK AREA IN SUPPORTING DIAL ACTIVITIES WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO GAIN QUALIFICATIONS AND WORK PLACEMENTS.?
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF GREAT YARMOUTH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.