Dogfen lywodraethu GREEN HILLS CHRISTIAN TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JANUARY 1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 28 JUNE 1978, 29 OCTOBER 1985, 9 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND 7 SEPTEMBER 2005. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 SEP 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 SEP 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE KINGDOM OF JESUS CHRIST AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT BY WAY OF GRANTS FOR THE CHRISTIAN EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR LEADERS AND THE FACILITATION OF THE SPIRITUAL, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL RECREATION, DEVELOPMENT AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN CHRISTIAN LEADERSHIP FOR CITIZENSHIP AND CHRISTIAN AND SOCIAL SERVICE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.