Dogfen lywodraethu Concordia (UK)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/07/1943 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JUN 2016 as amended on 19 Apr 2024 as amended on 19 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO HELP INDIVIDUALS, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE AND STUDENTS, BY PROVIDING WORK PLACEMENTS, VOLUNTEER, TRAINING AND/OR OTHER SIMILAR OPPORTUNITIES (BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY) TO ENABLE THEM AND ENCOURAGE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2 TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE, MANAGE, CONDUCT AND ASSIST WITH ANY FORM OF VOLUNTEERING, TRAINING OR WORK EXPERIENCE TO HELP INDIVIDUALS, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE AND STUDENTS, TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CHARACTER AND CAPABILITIES. 3 TO ENCOURAGE, PROVIDE AND ASSIST WITH SCHEMES OFFERING OPPORTUNITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE AND STUDENTS, TO EXPERIENCE CHANGES OF ENVIRONMENT AND TO DEVELOP A WIDER SENSE OF CROSS CULTURAL UNDERSTANDING, COMMUNITY AND CITIZENSHIP.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.