Dogfen lywodraethu TAVISTOCK SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND (KNOWN AS TAVISTOCK COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 17TH FEBRUARY 1932, 4TH OCTOBER 1951, 2ND SEPTEMBER 1966, 18TH AUGUST 1967 AND 10 DECEMBER 1984 AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 21 MARCH 2006 AND RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 18 JANUARY 2007 AND 9 OCTOBER 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTENDED TAVISTOCK SCHOOL, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE RURAL DISTRICT OF TAVISTOCK AND WHO ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 15 OF THE SCHEME OF 2ND SEPTEMBER 1966)
Maes buddion
THE RURAL DISTRICT OF TAVISTOCK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.