Trosolwg o’r elusen THE LORD WANDSWORTH FOUNDATION
Rhif yr elusen: 1143359-6
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
WILL PROVED ON 16/03/1912
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12/12/1955
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/08/1976
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25/08/2011
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31 OCT 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE FOR PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE IN NEED AND WHO WERE BORN IN GREAT BRITAIN, NORTHERN IRELAND, THE ISLE OF MAN OR THE CHANNEL ISLANDS OR WHO WOULD HAVE BEEN SO BORN IF THEIR PARENTS HAD NOT BEEN EMPLOYED FOR THE TIME BEING ABROAD AND WHO HAVE EITHER LOST ONE OR BOTH PARENTS OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE DIVORCED OR SEPARATED ("FOUNDATIONERS");
(2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY SUPPORTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT CHARITIES HAVING SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AT WHICH FOUNDATIONERS ARE PUPILS OR STUDENTS".
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM, ISLE OF MAN AND CHANNEL ISLANDS.
Hanes cofrestru
- 05 Gorffenaf 1966: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.