Dogfen lywodraethu THE RYE ART GALLERY TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 04/10/1957 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07/04/1987 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/05/1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/12/2012 as amended on 27 Mar 2018 as amended on 06 Apr 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROPAGATION OF KNOWLEDGE CONCERNING THE FINE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF PAINTING AND THE STIMULATION IN AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE SAME BY THE PROVISION AND ARRANGEMENT OF EXHIBITIONS AND LECTURES AND OF FACILITIES FOR INSTRUCTIONS IN THE SAME AND THE PRACTICE THEREOF, AND FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE RECREATION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN RYE
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF RYE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.