Dogfen lywodraethu OPEN AND DISTANCE LEARNING QUALITY COUNCIL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 18/2/1974,10/9/1974, 9/8/1985,26/7/1988 23/3/1991 AND 10/08/1995.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COUNCIL IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR TO RAISE STANDARDS OF TUITION, EDUCATION OR TRAINING CARRIED OUT WHOLLY OR IN PART BY POST. TO FURTHER ITS DEVELOPMENT ON SOUND AND PROGRESSIVE LINES, TO ENCOURAGE THE IMPROVEMENT OF EXISTING METHODS AND THE DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF NEW TECHNIQUES IN POSTAL TUITION AND THE LINKING, WHERE APPROPRIATE, OF CORRESPONDENCE COURSES WITH OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
EUROPEAN COMMUNITY AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.