Dogfen lywodraethu CARITAS CARE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 NOVEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 24 JUNE 1987, 29 MAY 1996, 23 MARCH 2005 AND 17 JULY 2008 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FURTHER THE GENERAL CHARITABLE WORKS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH BOTH IN THE DIOCESE OF LANCASTER AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUFFERING, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL JUSTICE AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTS WHICH PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES.
Maes buddion
ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF LANCASTER AND ELSEWHERE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.