Dogfen lywodraethu SUFFOLK FAMILY CARERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/12/2014 as amended on 25 Nov 2020 as amended on 07 Dec 2022 as amended on 25 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS SHALL BE THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS WITHIN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL HELP, SUPPORT SERVICES, ADVOCACY AND EDUCATION TO PERSONS WHO ARE ACTING AS CARERS OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITY, MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTY, LEARNING DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH OR WHO ARE AGED, AND THEIR FAMILIES AND BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND MEDIATION AND BY BRINGING TOGETHER THE REPRESENTATIVES OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Maes buddion
SUFFOLK AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.