Dogfen lywodraethu CARTREF NI LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/11/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE CHOICE AND INDEPENDENCE OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY OF ELDERLY PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED IN NORTH WALES IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES IN A PERSON'S HOME THUS ENABLING THEM TO LIVE IN THE COMMUNITY RATHER THAN IN INSTITUTIONAL CARE
Maes buddion
NORTH WALES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.