Dogfen lywodraethu BROMLEY HOUSE LIBRARY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 29 MAY 1998 AND 30 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 OCT 2017 as amended on 16 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE AND THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE LITERATURE FOR THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A LIBRARY TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND KNOWLEDGE OF LITERATURE AND ALL ARTISTIC AND SCIENTIFIC SUBJECTS AND BY PROVIDING LIBRARY FACILITIES FOR REFERENCE AND RESEARCH FACILITIES TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE BUILDING AND GARDENS KNOWN AS BROMLEY HOUSE, BEING A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST, VALUE AND BEAUTY
Maes buddion
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.