Dogfen lywodraethu CHAILEY HERITAGE FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 AUG 2017 as amended on 06 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE EDUCATION AND CARE OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND OTHER COMPLEX HEALTH NEEDS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS (THE BENEFICIARIES) INCLUDING THE CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SPECIAL SCHOOL (THE SCHOOL) WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS AND OF A TRANSITION SERVICE FOR BENEFICIARIES (THE OBJECTS).
Maes buddion
IN OR NEAR CHAILEY, EAST SUSSEX.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.