Dogfen lywodraethu SARWAR FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 20 NOVEMBER 2009. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 MAR 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PEOPLE OF PAKISTAN AND THE PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN THE UK AND ANYWHERE ELSE, TO; A) RELIEVE SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS; B) ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING; C) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIVING MAY BE IMPROVED; AND D) PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH.
Maes buddion
PAKISTAN, THE UK, AND ANYWHERE ELSE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.