Dogfen lywodraethu EQUALITY ACTION LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 APR 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 AUG 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JUN 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 FEB 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR RACE, AGE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, RELIGION AND BELIEF (B) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN ALL PERSONS, ESPECIALLY IN THE BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT)
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.