Dogfen lywodraethu INDEPENDENT TRAINING SERVICES LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2008 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/10/2011 as amended on 28 Feb 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS LIVING IN ENGLAND BY THE PROMOTION OF VOCATIONAL EDUCATION. (II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND OFFERING OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES.
Maes buddion
BARNSLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.