Dogfen lywodraethu TALKBACK-UK LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 30 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 AUGUST 2002 AND 7 DECEMBER 2006. as amended on 07 Aug 2021 as amended on 23 May 2022 as amended on 10 Jun 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The object of the Charity is: To provide advocacy and specific projects for people with a learning disability and/or autistic spectrum disorder and society’s other most vulnerable groups, that will support and enable individuals to obtain their full rights and privileges as citizens through teaching the skills of self-advocacy.
Maes buddion
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.