Dogfen lywodraethu GYNAECOLOGY CANCER RESEARCH FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 FEB 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE AND FUND RESEARCH INTO GYNAECOLOGICAL CANCERS AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND THEREBY TO RAISE AWARENESS OF AND THE PROFILE OF GYNAECOLOGICAL CANCERS, THEIR SIGNS AND SYMPTOMS, RISK FACTORS (INCLUDING BRCA AND INHERITED RISKS). TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WOMEN AFFECTED BY GYNAECOLOGICAL CANCERS, AND INHERITED RISK FACTORS (INCLUDING GENETIC MUTATIONS) BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR SUCH WOMEN, THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROFESSIONALS.?
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.