Dogfen lywodraethu Merlin Neuro Therapy Centre Ltd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/07/2013 as amended on 23 Aug 2022 as amended on 28 Jul 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity are to relieve sickness and to preserve and protect the physical and mental health of individuals with neurological conditions (including but not limited to multiple sclerosis), and people with neurodiversity, in such ways as the trustees think fit, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of assessments and therapies, advice, guidance, counselling, and other support services and facilities delivered at a purpose-built Centre in Cornwall and at other appropriate settings, and by using digital platforms.
Maes buddion
CORNWALL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.