Dogfen lywodraethu Sand Dams Worldwide Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 7TH MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 OCTOBER 2002. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 AUG 2016 as amended on 14 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- 1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS AND 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, CONSERVATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE UNDERTAKING AND DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH. (PLEASE SEE COPY OF THE SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON FILE FOR DETAILS).
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.