Dogfen lywodraethu The Tree of Life Centre Colne Valley
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION ON 7 JANUARY 2003 AS FURTHER AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION 1 MAY 2003. as amended on 14 Oct 2022 as amended on 15 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
I) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR IN THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE. II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN COUNSELLORS. III) TO PROMOTE GOOD STANDARDS IN PASTORAL CARE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM WITH REGARD BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE.
Maes buddion
THE UNITED KINGDOM IN PARTICULAR IN WEST YORKSHIRE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.