Dogfen lywodraethu THE CMA WELFARE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 AND 31 AUGUST 2003. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2003. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2016 as amended on 24 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE, AS ACCEPTED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS IN CHEADLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND WHO ARE OF THE MUSLIM FAITH 2. ACQUIRE OR PROVIDE LAND ,FACILITIES, AMENITIES, AND RESOURCES OR ACQUIRE, PROVIDE, CONSTRUCT, REPAIR, OR IMPROVE BUILDINGS, (EITHER ALONE OR TOGETHER WITH OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES)
Maes buddion
CHEADLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.